DE SB159 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This legislation provides clarification with respect to the placement, installation and maintenance of gateway signs to boundaries of political subdivisions and established non-incorporated areas of the State.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 17 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Outdoor Advertising And Signage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-07-01 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Committee (TRANSPORTATION/LAND USE AND INFRASTRUCTURE) in House with 6 On Its Merits |
2014-03-13 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 4 Favorable |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate |