DE SB116 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
No person who suffers an alcohol or drug overdose or other life threatening condition should die because of fear of criminal charges. It is within Delaware’s best interests to encourage reporting dangerous situations where they occur as not only does it save lives, but it also allows those persons saved to seek the treatment and assistance needed to regain a healthy lifestyle and be productive citizens and neighbors. This Act shall be known as the Kristen L. Jackson & John M. Perkins, Jr. Law. On January 31, 2012 Kristen L. Jackson passed away at the age of 23 years old. On May 5, 2011, John M. Perkins, Jr. passed away at the age of 30 years old. If the Good Samaritan 911 Law had been in effect the outcome may have been different. We hope in passing this law that it will save other parents from the pain their parents have endured. Author: Sen. Cloutier
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Seeking Help For An Alcohol Or Drug Overdose Or Other Life Threatening Medical Emergency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-06-26 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-26 | House | Necessary rules are suspended in House |
2013-06-26 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 10 On Its Merits |
2013-06-19 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 2 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |