DE HJR2 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-20)
Status: Passed on January 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-20)
Status: Passed on January 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This joint resolution rejects the report of the Delaware Compensation Commission in its entirety.
Title
Rejecting In Its Entirety The Report Of The Delaware Compensation Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Laid On Table in Senate |
2013-01-17 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-01-17 | House | Necessary rules are suspended in House |
2013-01-17 | House | Introduced in House |