DE HB72 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-08 - Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-08 - Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act will establish a one year minimum mandatory prison sentence to be imposed upon any person convicted of unlawfully carrying a concealed firearm.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Unlawful Carrying Of A Concealed Weapon.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mitchell [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Rep. Stephanie Bolden [D] | Rep. Quinton Johnson [D] |
Rep. Valerie Longhurst [D] | Rep. Joseph Miro [R] | Rep. Edward Osienski [D] | Rep. Michael Ramone [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-05-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-08 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |
2014-05-08 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 22 YES 17 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-05-08 | House | Restored in House |
2014-05-08 | House | Defeated by House of Representatives. Votes: Defeated 19 YES 18 NO 2 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-03-31 | House | Reported Out of Committee (APPROPRIATIONS) in House with 4 On Its Merits |
2013-06-04 | House | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House |
2013-05-08 | House | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 6 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits |
2013-04-11 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |