DE HB395 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill changes “shared rigging” to “fixed rigging” as it relates to certain requirements for fishing nets set in a series.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Finfishing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-12 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2014-06-25 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 36 YES 1 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-25 | House | Necessary rules are suspended in House |
2014-06-10 | House | Introduced in House and assigned to Natural Resources Committee |
2014-06-10 | House | Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House |