DE HB389 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Passed on July 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Passed on July 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
The bill extends the length of a constable commission from one year to two years, thereby reducing the frequency and burden of processing them annually. This is beneficial to both the licensing division of the State Police and the industry as a whole.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 10 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Constables.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-29 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Assigned to Public Safety Committee in Senate |
2014-06-18 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-11 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 9 On Its Merits |
2014-06-10 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |