DE HB365 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill is intended to codify three recommendations made by the Joint Sunset Committee. First, the bill increases the minimum number of yearly meetings from 2 to 4, and provides for the Chair or State Treasurer to set the agenda for special meetings. Second, the bill authorizes the Board, by a majority vote of its members, to enter into agreements to employ consultants. Finally, the bill moves administrative and budgetary support responsibilities from the Office of the State Treasurer to the Office of the Secretary of the Department of Finance.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Cash Management Policy Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-23 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 2 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Assigned to Sunset Committee in Senate |
2014-06-24 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-04 | House | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 4 Favorable |
2014-05-29 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House |