DE HB360 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on September 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on September 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill promotes the safety and welfare of our State’s growing number of patients who use dialysis centers. The bill enables and requires the Department of Health and Social Services to create standards for those centers. A direct concern expressly addressed in the bill is the lack of emergency energy sources, which may leave some patients with the need to hand-crank a machine in order to retrieve their blood.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Powers, Duties, Regulations And Orders Of The Department Of Health And Social Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 18 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |
2014-06-12 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-12 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-06-12 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Stricken |
2014-06-12 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced in House |
2014-06-12 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House |
2014-06-11 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 13 On Its Merits |
2014-06-03 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |