DE HB351 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill makes a housekeeping correction by changing a reference to the former “Violent Crimes Compensation Board” to the current name, Victims’ Compensation Assistance Program.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Freedom Of Information Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-21 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |
2014-06-19 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-04 | House | Reported Out of Committee (SUNSET COMMITTEE (POLICY ANALYSIS & GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY)) in House with 4 Favorable |
2014-05-29 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Sunset Committee (Policy Analysis & Government Accountability) Committee in House |