DE HB342 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill allows public water utilities and wastewater utilities to perform electrical work to maintain their plant and services in the same manner that other utilities are now permitted under current law.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 24 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Utilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-12 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES & ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Assigned to Natural Resources & Environmental Control Committee in Senate |
2014-06-12 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-04 | House | Reported Out of Committee (TRANSPORTATION/LAND USE AND INFRASTRUCTURE) in House with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-05-14 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House |