DE HB324 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act makes several changes to the Code relating to the Department of Finance.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 29 And 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Administrative Responsibilities Of The Department Of Finance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2024-03-19 | Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2024-03-19 | Passed By House. Votes: 33 YES 4 NO 4 ABSENT | |
2024-03-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Revenue & Finance) in House with 4 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2024-03-05 | Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House |