DE HB269 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill requires the Department of Finance to provide an anonymous reporting system for the reporting of individuals or businesses who have failed to obtain an occupational or business license.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Occupational And Business Licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 14 YES 7 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate |
2014-04-10 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Committee (REVENUE & FINANCE) in House with 7 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits |
2014-03-20 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House |