DE HB221 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 27 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [HTML]
Summary
The bill makes any "police officer" employed by the State and its political subdivisions not currently under the jurisdiction of the Police Officers' and Firefighters' Employment Relations Act subject to it. The purpose of this bill is to render all police and firefighters employed by the State not currently subject to the Police Officers' and Firefighters' Employment Relations Act subject to it. Nothing set forth in this bill is intended nor shall be construed to effect the rights of police officers and firefighters currently subject to the Police Officers' and Firefighters Employment Relations Act. In addition, employees classified in bargaining units pursuant to ยง1311A(b)(10) and (11) are not covered by this Act.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Police Officers And Firefighters Employment Relations Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-21 | Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate | |
2019-06-20 | Passed By House. Votes: 33 YES 8 ABSENT | |
2019-06-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 3 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-19 | was introduced and adopted in lieu of HS 2 for HB 221 |