DE HB199 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill declares that the shell of the channeled whelk, which contributes to the beauty of our seashores, as well as to the marine economy of the State of Delaware, shall be the official shell of the State.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To State Shell.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-06 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES & ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Natural Resources & Environmental Control Committee in Senate |
2014-01-28 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-01-15 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits |
2013-06-20 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |