DE HB198 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill would increase the maximum weekly benefit amount that would be payable to claimants seeking unemployment compensation benefits from the Delaware Division of Unemployment Insurance from $330 a week to $400 a week. The funds necessary to pay the increased weekly benefit amounts would be paid from the Unemployment Trust Fund. This bill would also freeze the taxable wage base used by employers to determine what portion of employees wages are subject to unemployment insurance tax assessments, for the period July 1, 2019 to October 29, 2020, to allow the Division of Unemployment Insurance and the Unemployment Compensation Advisory Council to analyze whether to revise the taxable wage base formula into the future.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Division Of Unemployment Compensation.
Sponsors
Rep. Edward Osienski [D] | Sen. Charles Paradee [D] | Sen. Jack Walsh [D] | Rep. David Bentz [D] |
Rep. William Bush [D] | Rep. Franklin Cooke [D] | Rep. Sean Matthews [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-26 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2019-06-26 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-21 | Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate | |
2019-06-20 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2019-06-18 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-14 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2019-06-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 2 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-10 | Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in House |