DE HB185 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Reported Out of Committee (Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Reported Out of Committee (Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill makes soccer the State Sport until June 30, 2020, then bicycling shall become the State Sport.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The State Sport.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Smith [R] | Sen. Catherine Cloutier [R] | Sen. Laura Sturgeon [D] | Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] |
Sen. David Sokola [D] | Rep. Krista Griffith [D] | Rep. Kendra Johnson [D] | Rep. Michael Ramone [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-21 | Assigned to Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2019-06-20 | Passed By House. Votes: 35 YES 6 ABSENT | |
2019-06-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 1 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-06 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |