DE HB173 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill makes changes to the Adult Correction Healthcare Review Committee by adding the chairpersons of the House and Senate Correction committees as ex-officio non-voting members. This bill also places this Committee within the Criminal Justice Council so the Committee has the administrative support it needs to effectuate its purpose. This bill also tasks the Committee with advising not only the Commissioner of the Department of Correction but also the Governor and the General Assembly on matters concerning inmate health-care services in our States correctional institutions. This bill makes clear that certain State agencies and contractors providing medical services to inmates must provide information requested by the Committee. This Committee is not a public body, and the bill emphasizes that Committee members must abide by federal and state laws regarding the privacy of protected health information and provides penalties for violations of the privacy of such information.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Prisons And Prisoners.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Schwartzkopf [D] | Sen. David McBride [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Rep. Melissa Minor-Brown [D] |
Rep. Stephanie Bolden [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | Signed by Governor | |
2019-06-13 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-12 | Reported Out of Committee (Corrections & Public Safety) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-11 | Assigned to Corrections & Public Safety Committee in Senate | |
2019-06-11 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2019-06-11 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 173 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-06-10 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 173 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-06-06 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-06 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2019-06-05 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-03 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |