DE HB133 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Reported Out of Committee (Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Reported Out of Committee (Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act amends the Delaware Governmental Accountability Act to make the annual budget process part of a performance management system of strategic planning, performance metrics and performance budgeting, dedicated to continuous process improvement that makes government more efficient, reduces costs and eliminates waste in the process and operations that deliver goods and services to taxpayers, customers and employees of State government.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Governmental Accountability Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2019-06-21 | Assigned to Elections, Govt. & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2019-06-20 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2019-05-15 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 4 On Its Merits | |
2019-05-02 | Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House |