DE HB130 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Passed on August 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Passed on August 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
State and federal laws limit the amount of nonprescription pseudoephedrine (“PSE”) consumers can buy to prevent diversion for production of methamphetamine. States, however, need an effective way to enforce those limits statewide and across state borders to curb the practice of “smurfing,” whereby criminals make purchases at multiple stores to acquire illegal quantifies of PSE. The solution is a multi-state PSE sales blocking system: the National Precursor Log Exchange system (NPLEx) which the National Association of Drug Diversion Investigators provides at no cost to states that have legislation requiring real-time electronic monitoring of precursor purchases and agree to use the system. Currently, 25 other states have adopted PSE tracking through NPLEx. The blocking technology monitors all nonprescription PSE purchases in real time to prevent meth criminals from exceeding legal limits. It also tracks purchases among all participating states so that meth cooks are unable to simply cross state lines to illegally obtain PSE.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Regulation Of Manufacture, Distribution And Dispensing Of Controlled Substances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-27 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Assigned to Public Safety Committee in Senate |
2013-06-04 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2013-05-15 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 6 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits |
2013-05-09 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |