DC PR25-0622 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Approved with Resolution Number R25-0464
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Approved with Resolution Number R25-0464
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commission on the Arts and Humanities Janice J. Kim Confirmation Resolution of 2024
Title
Commission on the Arts and Humanities Janice J. Kim Confirmation Resolution of 2024
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Council | Approved with Resolution Number R25-0464 |
2024-04-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-03-12 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2024-02-23 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-02-22 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2024-02-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on PR25-0622 Published in the DC Register |
2024-02-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2024-01-31 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |