DC B25-0718 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Act A25-0450 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004646
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Act A25-0450 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004646
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Rent Stabilized Housing Inflation Protection Continuation Temporary Amendment Act of 2024
Title
Rent Stabilized Housing Inflation Protection Continuation Temporary Amendment Act of 2024
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Council | Act A25-0450 Published in DC Register Vol 71 and Page 004646 |
2024-04-19 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is Jun 14, 2024 |
2024-04-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2024-04-15 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A25-0450 |
2024-04-09 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 23, 2024 |
2024-04-02 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2024-03-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0718 Published in the DC Register |
2024-03-05 | Council | First Reading |
2024-03-05 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2024-03-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |