DC B25-0461 | 2023-2024 | 25th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Leading Education Access for Reentry and Necessary Success Amendment Act 2023
Title
Leading Education Access for Reentry and Necessary Success Amendment Act 2023
Sponsors
Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Matthew Frumin [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Janeese Lewis George [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-16 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2023-12-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-12-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2023-09-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B25-0461 Published in the DC Register |
2023-09-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-09-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B25-0461 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/53774/Introduction/B25-0461-Introduction.pdf |