DC B20-0050 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-08 - Law L20-0026 Effective from Oct 17, 2013 Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 15319
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-11-08 - Law L20-0026 Effective from Oct 17, 2013 Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 15319
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Telemedicine Reimbursement Act Of 2013
Title
Telemedicine Reimbursement Act Of 2013
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Muriel Bowser [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-26 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - Council - 1st Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - Council - 1st Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-08 | Council | Law L20-0026 Effective from Oct 17, 2013 Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 15319 |
2013-08-02 | Council | Act A20-0119 Published in DC Register Vol 60 and Page 11117 |
2013-07-25 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2013-07-23 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A20-0119 |
2013-07-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jul 29, 2013 |
2013-06-26 | Council | Final Reading |
2013-06-04 | Council | 1st Reading |
2013-05-15 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2013-05-08 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B20-0050 |
2013-02-07 | Council | Public Hearing on B20-0050 |
2013-01-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0050 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2013-01-08 | Council | B20-0050 Introduced by Councilmember Cheh at Legislative Meeting |