CT SB00885 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To ensure that individuals with substantiated abuse or neglect allegations against persons receiving services from the Department of Developmental Services are not permitted to serve as volunteers for charitable organizations such as the Special Olympics.
Title
An Act Permitting Inquiry Access To The Department Of Developmental Services' Abuse And Neglect Registry For Charitable Organizations Which Recruit Volunteers To Work With Persons With Intellectual Disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-18 - House - House Roll Call Vote 128 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 99 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 99 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-31 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-05-25 | Public Act 11-26 | |
2011-05-18 | In Concurrence | |
2011-05-18 | House Passed | |
2011-05-10 | Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-10 | No New File by Committee on Public Safety and Security | |
2011-05-10 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-10 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-05-10 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-05-04 | Referred by House to Committee on Public Safety and Security | |
2011-04-28 | House Calendar Number 400 | |
2011-04-28 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-04-27 | On Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Passed | |
2011-03-21 | File Number 120 | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Calendar Number 118 | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-03-21 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-03-07 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-07 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-02-04 | Public Hearing 02/09 | |
2011-02-03 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |