CT SB00396 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - House Calendar Number 441
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - House Calendar Number 441
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement task force recommendations for the elderly nutrition program.
Title
An Act Implementing Task Force Recommendations For The Elderly Nutrition Program.
Sponsors
House Human Services Committee | Rep. Eleni Kavros DeGraw [D] | Rep. Kerry Szeps Wood [D] | Rep. Michelle Cook [D] |
Rep. Anne Hughes [D] | Rep. Jane Garibay [D] | Rep. Patricia Dillon [D] | Sen. Kevin Kelly [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 141 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Change of Reference) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Joint - HS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Change of Reference) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | House Calendar Number 441 |
2024-05-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4843 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | File Number 575 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 352 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/24 12:00 PM |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/14 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |