CT SB00325 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - File Number 119
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - File Number 119
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Children and Families to conduct a study to determine whether policy and procedural changes within the Department of Children and Families may improve the welfare of children.
Title
An Act Concerning Children's Welfare.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | File Number 119 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 105 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/25/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/05 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |