CT SB00304 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require recipients of financial assistance for construction projects from the Department of Economic and Community Development, in amounts that require approval from the General Assembly, to file reports concerning employment and wage information for each of the businesses contracted to perform such construction.
Title
An Act Maximizing Jobs For State Workers By Requiring Local Construction Hiring Reports By Recipients Of Economic Development Funds.
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | Rep. Edwin Vargas [D] | Sen. Andres Ayala [D] | Rep. Thomas Vicino [D] |
Rep. Victor Cuevas [D] | Rep. Peter Tercyak [D] | Sen. Catherine Osten [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-23 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2014-04-07 | Senate | File Number 381 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 250 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/14 10:00 AM |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |