CT SB00113 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To grant access to original birth records to all adopted persons eighteen years of age or older who were born in Connecticut regardless of date of birth.
Title
An Act Concerning Access To Original Birth Certificates By Adult Adopted Persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |