CT SB00029 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on May 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on May 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Authorizing And Adjusting Bonds Of The State For Capital Improvements, Transportation And Other Purposes, And Concerning Miscellaneous Programs, Including The Smart Start Program, The Water Improvement System Program, School Security Grants, The Regenerative Medicine Research Fund, The Connecticut Manufacturing Innovation Fund And The Board Of Regents For Higher Education Infrastructure Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 330 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A,B (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 322 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 5514 (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 271 AS AMENDED (Y: 134 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 322 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 5514 (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 271 AS AMENDED (Y: 134 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Public Act 14-98 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2014-05-06 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B |
2014-05-06 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B |
2014-05-06 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-06 | Senate | House Calendar Number 534 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 5607 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5514 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | File Number 653 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 441 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/14 10:00 AM |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |