CT SB00023 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-9)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning Benefit Corporations And Encouraging Social Enterprise.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-24 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2014-04-17 | Senate | File Number 603 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 397 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/14 5:00 PM |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |