CT HB05527 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-11 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To establish certain requirements for the employment of domestic workers in the state.
Title
An Act Concerning The Task Force On Domestic Workers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 377 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 376 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 5655 (Y: 15 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 211 AS AMENDED (Y: 113 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 376 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 5655 (Y: 15 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 211 AS AMENDED (Y: 113 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Special Act 14-17 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 5655 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-02 | Senate | File Number 746 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 553 |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2014-05-01 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2014-05-01 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4246 |
2014-04-02 | House | File Number 308 |
2014-04-02 | House | House Calendar Number 188 |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-02 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-27 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/01/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-19 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-18 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-03-13 | House | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2014-03-10 | House | Public Hearing 03/13 |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |