CT HB05521 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To permit any state, quasi-public or municipal agency to send communications using electronic or digital methods instead of by mail and to make a technical change.
Title
An Act Concerning The Use Of An Electronic Delivery Service Under The Connecticut Uniform Electronic Transactions Act And Defining Electronic Mail.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 442 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 267 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 267 AS AMENDED (Y: 140 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-06-01 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-30 | Public Act 12-185 | |
2012-05-09 | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-07 | Senate Calendar Number 517 | |
2012-05-07 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-05-07 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |
2012-05-07 | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-07 | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5213 | |
2012-04-17 | File Number 491 | |
2012-04-17 | House Calendar Number 367 | |
2012-04-17 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-17 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-10 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/16/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-30 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-29 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-03-16 | Public Hearing 03/21 | |
2012-03-14 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |