CT HB05326 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-30 - File Number 772
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-30 - File Number 772
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To prohibit the capture and use of facial recognition technology for commercial purposes without an individual's consent.
Title
An Act Requiring Certain Retail Business Establishments To Display Signs Regarding The Use Of Facial Recognition Technology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 183 AS AMENDED (Y: 128 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-30 | Senate | File Number 772 |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 559 |
2016-04-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2016-04-29 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-29 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 4458 |
2016-03-21 | House | File Number 64 |
2016-03-21 | House | House Calendar Number 81 |
2016-03-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-03-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/16 10:00 AM |
2016-03-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-04 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2016-02-19 | House | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |