CT HB05223 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - File Number 660
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - File Number 660
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To make minor, technical and conforming changes to certain agriculture-related statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning Minor Revisions To Agriculture Related Statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-01 - House - House Roll Call Vote 115 AS AMENDED (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | Senate | File Number 660 |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 437 |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-05-01 | House | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2024-05-01 | House | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 5170 |
2024-03-21 | House | File Number 83 |
2024-03-21 | House | House Calendar Number 86 |
2024-03-21 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-21 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-15 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-11 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-08 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-02-23 | House | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |