CT HB05128 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require each institution of higher education to disclose its scholarship displacement policies.
Title
An Act Requiring Disclosure Of Scholarship Displacement Policies At Institutions Of Higher Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 303 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 174 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 174 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2024-05-28 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2024-05-28 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2024-05-20 | House | Public Act 24-87 |
2024-05-08 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 469 |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-05-06 | Senate | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2024-05-06 | House | House Passed |
2024-03-14 | House | File Number 31 |
2024-03-14 | House | House Calendar Number 52 |
2024-03-14 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-14 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-08 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/13/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-04 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-02-29 | House | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-15 | House | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2024-02-14 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |