CT HB05043 | 2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - File Number 493
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - File Number 493
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Implementing The Budget Recommendations Of The Governor Concerning Education.
Sponsors
Rep. Brendan Sharkey [D] | Rep. Joseph Aresimowicz [D] | Sen. Donald Williams [D] | Sen. Martin Looney [D] |
Rep. Michael D'Agostino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | House | File Number 493 |
2014-04-10 | House | House Calendar Number 286 |
2014-04-10 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2014-04-10 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-04-04 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/14 5:00 PM |
2014-03-25 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2014-03-24 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2014-02-27 | House | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |