CT HB05004 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 61-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - File Number 613
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - File Number 613
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement certain measures relating to climate change including advancing and implementing the state's goals for the reduction of greenhouse gas emissions, the phasing out of the use of natural gas, investment in renewable energy and green economy startup businesses, incentivizing sustainable purchasing by local governments and the enhancement of nature-based solutions to mitigate climate change.
Title
An Act Concerning The Implementation Of Certain Climate Change Measures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 37 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | File Number 613 |
2024-04-25 | House | Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-25 | House | New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-04-25 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-25 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/30/24 5:00 PM |
2024-04-22 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-22 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-04-16 | House | Referred by House to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-04-08 | House | File Number 321 |
2024-04-08 | House | House Calendar Number 216 |
2024-04-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-08 | House | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-04-01 | House | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/08/24 12:00 PM |
2024-03-20 | House | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-20 | House | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2024-03-01 | House | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2024-02-29 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |