CO SJR009 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning changes to the Joint Rules of the Senate and House of Representatives regarding workplace policies.
Title
Workplace Harassment & Expectations Policies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 54 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-14 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-12 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/14/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-03-13 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-03-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 02/26/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |