CO SB215 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 2 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-03 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning modification of the effective date of House Bill 24-1421.
Title
Modify Effective Date of House Bill 24-1421
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-215 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-215 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-215 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-215 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-05-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2024-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-30 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-04-30 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |