CO SB207 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning unemployment insurance.
Title
Unemployment Insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Repass (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-207 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-207 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-207 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-207, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.013 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.012 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-207, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-13 - Senate - Senate: House Amendments Concur (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-207 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-207 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-06 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 20-207 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.008 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-207, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.013 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.012 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 20-207, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2020-06-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-11 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-06-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2020-06-10 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-09 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2020-06-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-06 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-06-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |