CO SB195 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning modifications to the conservation district grant fund.
Title
Modifications To Conservation District Grant Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-195 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 22-195 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-195 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 22-195, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 22-195, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-195 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer Senate Bill 22-195 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 22-195 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 22-195, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 22-195, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-25 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-06 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-05-04 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-04 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-05-02 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-04-27 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |