CO SB172 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 23 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 23 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning changing the phrase "industrial hemp product" to the phrase "hemp product" in the statutes that regulate marijuana.
Title
Hemp Product Definition Marijuana Regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 24-172 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 24-172 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 24-172 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer Senate Bill 24-172 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2024-04-23 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-04-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-08 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |