CO SB111 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 8:00 am in Room Old State Library
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 8:00 am in Room Old State Library
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a reduction in the valuation for assessment of qualified-senior primary residence real property.
Title
Senior Primary Residence Prop Tax Reduction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - House Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-111, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-111 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-111, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E). (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-111, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-111 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-111, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E). (Y: 2 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer Senate Bill 24-111, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-03-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |