CO SB030 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Distinguished Flying Cross License Plate Waive Fee
Title
Distinguished Flying Cross License Plate Waive Fee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-030, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.003This is a conceptual amendment The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-030 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-030 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Reconsider the previous motion to refer Senate Bill 14-030 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Reconsider the previous motion to refer Senate Bill 14-030 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-030 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-030 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-030 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-030, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-030, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-030 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-030 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - J.003This is a conceptual amendment The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-030 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-030 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Reconsider the previous motion to refer Senate Bill 14-030 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Reconsider the previous motion to refer Senate Bill 14-030 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-030 to the Committee on Finance (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-030 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-030 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-030, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-030, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-030 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer Senate Bill 14-030 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-26 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Reconsider |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-04-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-17 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-17 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-20 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-03-05 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Finance |
2014-02-27 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-02-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy + Finance + Appropriations |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |