CO HJR1017 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-24)
Status: Passed on March 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 64-24)
Status: Passed on March 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Signed by the President of the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning renaming bridge I-04-K on U.S. highway 50 over the Gunnison river as the "Brigadier General Felix Sparks Memorial Bridge".
Title
Brigadier General Felix Sparks Memorial Bridge
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2024-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2024-02-23 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-02-16 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 02/23/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |