CO HJR1003 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the designation of United States Highway 24 from the intersection of Garrett Road to the intersection of Elbert Road in Falcon, Colorado, as the "SGM James Gregory Ryan Sartor Memorial Highway".
Title
Designate Portion Of Highway 24 For SGM Sergeant Major Sartor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Consideration of Resolutions Resolution (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: RESOLUTIONS Res (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |
2020-02-07 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-01-31 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-01-12 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |