CO HB1426 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning legislative engagement in the management of state operations.
Title
Limit Emergency Spending And Authorize Additional Appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-15 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1426, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1426 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1426, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1426 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-15 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-13 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2020-06-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-11 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-11 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-06-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |