CO HB1374 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
On-demand Air Carrier Sales & Use Tax Exemption
Title
On-demand Air Carrier Sales & Use Tax Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1374 to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1374, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1374, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-05-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2014-04-28 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-24 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-23 | House | House Committee on Finance Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2014-04-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |