CO HB1372 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Unauthorized Advertising For Adoption Purposes
Title
Unauthorized Advertising For Adoption Purposes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1372 to the Committee of the Whole, with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1372 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1372 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-05-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-04-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-23 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2014-04-22 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |