CO HB1353 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning requirements to engage in the business of dealing in firearms, and, in connection therewith, establishing a state firearms dealer permit and making an appropriation.
Title
Firearms Dealer Requirements & Permit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.001) (Y: 17 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1353, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1353, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1353, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1353, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1353, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.001) (Y: 17 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1353, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1353, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1353, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1353, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 24-1353, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2024-04-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-17 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-08 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-03-27 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Finance |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |